Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB645 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 II
22 119THCONGRESS
33 1
44 STSESSION S. 645
55 To award a Congressional Gold Medal, collectively, to the individuals and
66 communities who volunteered or donated items to the North Platte Can-
77 teen in North Platte, Nebraska, during World War II from December
88 25, 1941, to April 1, 1946.
99 IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
1010 FEBRUARY20, 2025
1111 Mrs. F
1212 ISCHER(for herself and Mr. RICKETTS) introduced the following bill;
1313 which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Hous-
1414 ing, and Urban Affairs
1515 A BILL
1616 To award a Congressional Gold Medal, collectively, to the
1717 individuals and communities who volunteered or donated
1818 items to the North Platte Canteen in North Platte, Ne-
1919 braska, during World War II from December 25, 1941,
2020 to April 1, 1946.
2121 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
2222 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
2323 SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
2424 This Act may be cited as the ‘‘North Platte Canteen 4
2525 Congressional Gold Medal Act’’. 5
2626 SEC. 2. FINDINGS. 6
2727 The Congress finds the following: 7
2828 VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:10 Mar 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S645.IS S645
2929 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2
3030 •S 645 IS
3131 (1) Home-front volunteerism was integral to the 1
3232 victory of the United States during World War II. 2
3333 Numerous exemplars of patriotism emerged through-3
3434 out the Midwest, galvanizing the rural United States 4
3535 and the rest of the country supporting the war ef-5
3636 fort. 6
3737 (2) The North Platte Canteen in North Platte, 7
3838 Nebraska, was one of the largest volunteer efforts of 8
3939 World War II. 9
4040 (3) Canteen services boosted morale in the 10
4141 United States by providing free, wholesome enter-11
4242 tainment to troops traveling across the country. Ap-12
4343 proximately 120 community-based canteens operated 13
4444 in the United States during World War II. 14
4545 (4) The North Platte Canteen greeted and 15
4646 served food to approximately 6,000,000 United 16
4747 States troops traveling across the United States 17
4848 from December 25, 1941, to April 1, 1946. 18
4949 (5) On December 17, 1941, the residents of 19
5050 North Platte, Nebraska, received information that a 20
5151 train of Nebraska National Guardsmen would be 21
5252 traveling through North Platte en route to the West 22
5353 Coast of the United States. Although the train car-23
5454 ried members of the Kansas National Guard, resi-24
5555 dents of the community welcomed the men from 25
5656 VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:10 Mar 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S645.IS S645
5757 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3
5858 •S 645 IS
5959 Kansas with food and other items as an appreciation 1
6060 for their service. 2
6161 (6) On December 18, 1941, Rae Wilson, of 3
6262 North Platte, proposed to her community the idea of 4
6363 establishing the North Platte Canteen so that resi-5
6464 dents could greet United States troops en route to 6
6565 serving the United States in the European Theater 7
6666 or the Pacific Theater. 8
6767 (7) 55,000 individuals, the majority of whom 9
6868 were women, from 125 communities in Nebraska, 10
6969 Colorado, and Kansas donated food and volunteered 11
7070 at the North Platte Canteen for approximately 5 12
7171 years. 13
7272 (8) The North Platte Canteen provided hospi-14
7373 tality to as many as 24 troop trains per day. During 15
7474 a 1-month period, the volunteers at the Canteen 16
7575 served over 40,000 homemade cookies, 30,000 hard- 17
7676 boiled eggs, 6,500 doughnuts, 4,000 loaves of bread, 18
7777 3,000 pounds of meat, 450 pounds of cheese, 60 19
7878 quarts of peanut butter, 1,350 pounds of coffee, 20
7979 1,000 quarts of cream, 750 dozen rolls, and 600 21
8080 birthday cakes. 22
8181 (9) The North Platte Canteen principally oper-23
8282 ated at the Union Pacific Railroad station in North 24
8383 Platte, Nebraska, with volunteers from local commu-25
8484 VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:10 Mar 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S645.IS S645
8585 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 4
8686 •S 645 IS
8787 nities, organizations, churches, schools, and other 1
8888 groups, and without Federal assistance. 2
8989 (10) $137,000 in cash contributions supported 3
9090 the operations of the North Platte Canteen for al-4
9191 most 5 years. The funds were raised through benefit 5
9292 dances, scrap-metal drives, school victory clubs, do-6
9393 nation cans in local businesses, and from the rel-7
9494 atives of troops who traveled through the North 8
9595 Platte area. 9
9696 (11) In December 1943, the North Platte Can-10
9797 teen was honored by the United States Army with 11
9898 the presentation of the Meritorious Wartime Service 12
9999 Award by the Secretary of War. 13
100100 (12) In 2004, the 108th Congress passed a res-14
101101 olution recognizing the heroic efforts of those who 15
102102 made enormous sacrifices to make the North Platte 16
103103 Canteen a success during World War II. 17
104104 SEC. 3. CONGRESSIONAL GOLD MEDAL. 18
105105 (a) P
106106 RESENTATIONAUTHORIZED.—The Speaker of 19
107107 the House of Representatives and the President pro tem-20
108108 pore of the Senate shall make appropriate arrangements 21
109109 for the presentation, on behalf of Congress, of a gold 22
110110 medal of appropriate design to the individuals and commu-23
111111 nities who volunteered or donated items to the North 24
112112 VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:10 Mar 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S645.IS S645
113113 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 5
114114 •S 645 IS
115115 Platte Canteen in North Platte, Nebraska, during World 1
116116 War II. 2
117117 (b) D
118118 ESIGN ANDSTRIKING.—For purposes of the 3
119119 presentation described in subsection (a), the Secretary of 4
120120 the Treasury (referred to in this Act as the ‘‘Secretary’’) 5
121121 shall strike a gold medal with suitable emblems, devices, 6
122122 and inscriptions, to be determined by the Secretary. 7
123123 (c) L
124124 INCOLNCOUNTYHISTORICALMUSEUM.—Fol-8
125125 lowing the presentation described in subsection (a), the 9
126126 gold medal shall be given to the Lincoln County Historical 10
127127 Museum in North Platte, Nebraska, where the medal shall 11
128128 be available for display as appropriate and made available 12
129129 for research. 13
130130 SEC. 4. DUPLICATE MEDALS. 14
131131 The Secretary may strike and sell duplicates in 15
132132 bronze of the gold medal struck under section 3, at a price 16
133133 sufficient to cover the costs of the medals, including labor, 17
134134 materials, dies, use of machinery, and overhead expenses. 18
135135 SEC. 5. STATUS OF MEDALS. 19
136136 (a) N
137137 ATIONALMEDALS.—Medals struck under this 20
138138 Act are national medals for purposes of chapter 51 of title 21
139139 31, United States Code. 22
140140 (b) N
141141 UMISMATICITEMS.—For purposes of sections 23
142142 5134 and 5136 of title 31, United States Code, all medals 24
143143 VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:10 Mar 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S645.IS S645
144144 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 6
145145 •S 645 IS
146146 struck under this Act shall be considered to be numismatic 1
147147 items. 2
148148 SEC. 6. AUTHORITY TO USE FUND AMOUNTS; PROCEEDS OF 3
149149 SALE. 4
150150 (a) A
151151 UTHORITYTOUSEFUNDAMOUNTS.—There is 5
152152 authorized to be charged against the United States Mint 6
153153 Public Enterprise Fund such amounts as may be nec-7
154154 essary to pay for the costs of the medals struck under 8
155155 this Act. 9
156156 (b) P
157157 ROCEEDS OFSALE.—Amounts received from the 10
158158 sale of duplicate bronze medals authorized under section 11
159159 4 shall be deposited into the United States Mint Public 12
160160 Enterprise Fund. 13
161161 Æ
162162 VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:10 Mar 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S645.IS S645
163163 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB