Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SR125 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/14/2025

                            III 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. RES. 125 
Commemorating the centennial of Delta Air Lines. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
MARCH12, 2025 
Mr. O
SSOFF(for himself, Mr. CURTIS, Mr. WARNOCK, and Mr. LEE) sub-
mitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on 
the Judiciary 
RESOLUTION 
Commemorating the centennial of Delta Air Lines. 
Whereas, on March 2, 2025, Delta Air Lines turns 100 years 
old, becoming the first United States airline to reach the 
centenarian milestone; 
Whereas Delta Air Lines was founded on March 2, 1925, as 
Huff Daland Dusters—the world’s first aerial crop-dust-
ing company; 
Whereas Delta Air Service and the airline’s first flights took 
off 4 years later; 
Whereas, in 2025, Delta Air Lines’s team of 100,000 people 
supports up to 5,000 daily flights serving more than 
200,000,000 travelers per year; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:04 Mar 13, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SR125.IS SR125
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•SRES 125 IS 
Whereas Delta Air Lines maintains hubs from coast to coast, 
including in Georgia, Massachusetts, New York, Wash-
ington, California, Michigan, Minnesota, and Utah; 
Whereas, with thousands of peak-day departures to more 
than 290 global destinations on 6 continents, Delta Air 
Lines connects millions of people around the globe to and 
through the United States daily and helps keep the 
United States a top country for business and the econ-
omy of the United States strong; 
Whereas, for the past 100 years, the mission of Delta Air 
Lines to connect the world has included a commitment to 
being a strong partner in the communities where its peo-
ple live, work, and serve; and 
Whereas, in 2025, Delta was named North America’s most 
on-time airline by Cirium, the Top United States Airline 
by the Wall Street Journal, the World’s Most Admired 
Airline by Fortune, and the top-ranked airline on Time’s 
inaugural World’s Best Companies List: Now, therefore 
be it 
Resolved, That the Senate— 1
(1) recognizes Delta Air Lines for 100 years of 2
connecting people to the world and to each other; 3
and 4
(2) commemorates the centennial of Delta Air 5
Lines. 6
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:04 Mar 13, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SR125.IS SR125
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS