Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SR151 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/02/2025

                            III 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. RES. 151 
Expressing the sense of the Senate that the United States should recognize 
the 1994 genocide in Rwanda as ‘‘the genocide against the Tutsi in Rwanda’’. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
APRIL1 (legislative day, MARCH31), 2025 
Mr. R
OUNDS(for himself and Mr. COONS) submitted the following resolution; 
which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations 
RESOLUTION 
Expressing the sense of the Senate that the United States 
should recognize the 1994 genocide in Rwanda as ‘‘the 
genocide against the Tutsi in Rwanda’’. 
Whereas, in 2018, the United Nations General Assembly 
amended the title of the annual observance of the geno-
cide in Rwanda on April 7 to be the ‘‘International Day 
of Reflection on the 1994 Genocide against the Tutsi in 
Rwanda’’; 
Whereas United States officials have noted publicly that the 
genocide in Rwanda was ‘‘intended to destroy Tutsi’’; 
Whereas, on April 7, 2023, Secretary of State Blinken stated, 
‘‘The U.S. stands with Rwanda . . . in remembering the 
Tutsi victims of genocide. We also mourn the others who 
were murdered for their opposition to a genocidal re-
gime.’’; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:59 Apr 02, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SR151.IS SR151
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•SRES 151 IS 
Whereas the United States Integrated Country Strategy for 
Rwanda (approved March 14, 2022) refers to the ‘‘1994 
genocide against the Tutsi ethnic group’’; 
Whereas Rwandan officials, in appropriately opposing geno-
cide denial or revisionism, aptly note that any nomen-
clature that does not specifically use the phrase ‘‘geno-
cide against the Tutsi’’ is ‘‘ambiguous’’ and conducive to 
genocide denial or revisionism; 
Whereas the United States Holocaust Memorial Museum 
notes in its public educational materials on the ‘‘genocide 
in Rwanda’’ that the victims were ‘‘predominantly Tutsi’’ 
and that the goal of Hutu extremist leaders was for 
‘‘Rwandan Tutsis to be exterminated’’; 
Whereas the United States-based nongovernmental organiza-
tion Human Rights Watch, which played a central role 
in documenting the genocide in Rwanda and in sup-
porting international efforts to bring the perpetrators to 
justice, found that the ‘‘Tutsi were being targeted for 
elimination’’; 
Whereas European diplomats refer to the ‘‘genocide against 
the Tutsi’’ in public statements; 
Whereas, starting in 2022, the Government of the United 
Kingdom has used the terminology ‘‘genocide against the 
Tutsi’’; and 
Whereas the United States is the only major country in the 
world to publicly reject the terminology ‘‘genocide against 
the Tutsi’’: Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved, That it is the sense of the Senate that— 1
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:59 Apr 02, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR151.IS SR151
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 
•SRES 151 IS 
(1) the United States should recognize the 1994 1
genocide in Rwanda as ‘‘the genocide against the 2
Tutsi in Rwanda’’; 3
(2) the Secretary of State should publicly af-4
firm that terminology; and 5
(3) other types of atrocities occurred alongside 6
the genocide against the Tutsi, and the history of 7
the genocide should clearly affirm the other experi-8
ences of mass violence against Rwandans during the 9
same period, including the killings and other violence 10
experienced by Hutus and the Indigenous Twa com-11
munity, perpetrated by Hutu extremist militias. 12
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:59 Apr 02, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SR151.IS SR151
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS