Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SR163 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/10/2025

                            III 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. RES. 163 
Recognizing the contributions of Clela Rorex, a pioneering county clerk who, 
in 1975, advanced civil rights for all couples seeking to be married. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
APRIL9, 2025 
Mr. B
ENNET(for himself and Mr. HICKENLOOPER) submitted the following 
resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary 
RESOLUTION 
Recognizing the contributions of Clela Rorex, a pioneering 
county clerk who, in 1975, advanced civil rights for all 
couples seeking to be married. 
Whereas Clela Ann Rorex (referred to in this preamble as 
‘‘Clela’’) was born in Denver on July 23, 1943; 
Whereas Ruby Rorex, the mother of Clela, was a dance and 
theater teacher, and Cecil Rorex, the father of Clela, 
served for 30 years as clerk of Routt County, Colorado, 
where Clela grew up in Steamboat Springs; 
Whereas Clela earned her bachelor’s degree from the Univer-
sity of Colorado Boulder in 1973 and a master’s degree 
in Public Administration from the University of Colorado 
Denver in 1981; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:01 Apr 10, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SR163.IS SR163
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•SRES 163 IS 
Whereas, in January 1975, at the age of 31, Clela became 
the Boulder County Clerk and Recorder; 
Whereas, in 1975, when a same-sex couple requested a mar-
riage license in Boulder County, Clela consulted the as-
sistant district attorney and learned that Colorado state 
laws did not specifically prohibit granting a marriage li-
cense to a same-sex couple; 
Whereas, as a newly elected county clerk, Clela issued a mar-
riage license to Dave McCord and Dave Zamora, the first 
marriage license issued to a same-sex couple in the 
United States; 
Whereas Clela was quoted in 2016 as saying, ‘‘After having 
been so deeply involved in the women’s rights movements, 
who was I to then deny a right to anyone else? It wasn’t 
my job to legislate morality.’’; 
Whereas, after issuing the first marriage license to a same- 
sex couple in 1975, Clela issued 5 more marriage licenses 
to same-sex couples over the next month; 
Whereas national news outlets circulated the groundbreaking 
story of Clela issuing marriage licenses to same-sex cou-
ples, after which Clela reported receiving a deluge of 
death threats and condemnation in hundreds of letters 
and phone calls to the Boulder County Clerk’s office; 
Whereas, despite the threats, Clela continued her advocacy 
efforts on behalf of the LGBTQ community, including by 
marching, volunteering, and donating to LGBTQ efforts 
for decades; 
Whereas, in 2014, a series of court rulings cleared the way 
for same-sex marriages in Colorado, and, in 2015, the 
Supreme Court of the United States legalized same-sex 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:01 Apr 10, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SR163.IS SR163
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 
•SRES 163 IS 
marriage nationwide, 40 years after Clela issued the first 
same-sex marriage license in the United States; 
Whereas Clela was 78 years old when she died on June 19, 
2022, in Longmont, Colorado; 
Whereas, in honor of Clela and her advocacy for human 
rights, Boulder County, Colorado, declared July 23, 
2022, to be ‘‘Clela Rorex Day’’; and 
Whereas Clela should be recognized for her leadership as a 
national civil rights leader, paving the way for countless 
individuals: Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved, That the Senate— 1
(1) recognizes— 2
(A) the contributions of Clela Rorex as a 3
pioneer for civil rights and same-sex marriage; 4
(B) the respect and bravery Clela Rorex 5
demonstrated when issuing the first same-sex 6
marriage license in the United States; and 7
(C) the courage Clela Rorex exhibited fol-8
lowing the threats she received when she issued 9
marriage licenses to same-sex couples; and 10
(2) designates March 26, 2025, as ‘‘Clela Rorex 11
Day’’. 12
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:01 Apr 10, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SR163.IS SR163
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS