Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SR25 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/15/2025

                            III 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. RES. 25 
Condemning the commutation of the death sentence of Marvin Charles 
Gabrion II granted by President Biden on December 23, 2024. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
JANUARY14, 2025 
Mr. C
OTTONsubmitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
Committee on the Judiciary 
RESOLUTION 
Condemning the commutation of the death sentence of 
Marvin Charles Gabrion II granted by President Biden 
on December 23, 2024. 
Resolved, 1
SECTION 1. SENSE OF THE SENATE REGARDING THE COM-2
MUTATION OF THE DEATH SENTENCE OF 3
MARVIN CHARLES GABRION II GRANTED BY 4
PRESIDENT BIDEN ON DECEMBER 23, 2024. 5
It is the sense of the Senate that— 6
(1) President Joseph R. Biden undermined the 7
rule of law and robbed victims of justice when he 8
commuted the death sentence of Marvin Charles 9
Gabrion II on December 23, 2024; 10
VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:21 Jan 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR25.IS SR25
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•SRES 25 IS 
(2) Marvin Gabrion was sentenced to death for 1
murdering 19-year-old Rachel Timmerman just 2 2
days before she was scheduled to testify that 3
Gabrion had abducted and raped her; 4
(3) Marvin Gabrion was also the prime suspect 5
in the disappearance and murder of several other in-6
dividuals, including Rachel Timmerman’s 11-month- 7
old daughter and 2 potential witnesses at his rape 8
trial; 9
(4) this commutation is a reprehensible insult 10
to the victims of Marvin Gabrion; 11
(5) President Biden claimed that he commuted 12
the death sentences of Marvin Gabrion and 36 other 13
murderers out of a principled opposition to the death 14
penalty but refused to commute the death sentences 15
of the 3 most controversial death row inmates, dem-16
onstrating that President Biden was motivated by 17
politics, not principles; and 18
(6) the Senate unequivocally condemns this 19
commutation. 20
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:21 Jan 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SR25.IS SR25
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS