Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SR72 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 III
22 119THCONGRESS
33 1
44 STSESSION S. RES. 72
55 Affirming that Hamas cannot retain any political or military control in
66 the Gaza Strip .
77 IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
88 FEBRUARY11, 2025
99 Mr. G
10-RAHAM(for himself, Mr. BLUMENTHAL, Mr. COTTON, Ms. ROSEN, Mrs.
11-B
12-RITT, and Mr. FETTERMAN) submitted the following resolution; which
13-was referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations
14-M
15-ARCH13, 2025
16-Committee discharged; considered and agreed to
10+RAHAM(for himself, Mr. BLUMENTHAL, Mr. COTTON, Ms. ROSEN, and
11+Mrs. B
12+RITT) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the
13+Committee on Foreign Relations
1714 RESOLUTION
1815 Affirming that Hamas cannot retain any political or military
1916 control in the Gaza Strip .
2017 Whereas Hamas was established in 1987, with the Hamas
2118 Covenant stating ‘‘Israel will exist and will continue to
2219 exist until [it is] obliterate[d]’’ clearly signifying the in-
2320 tent of Hamas to destroy the State of Israel, eradicate
2421 the Jewish population, and undermine peace and pros-
2522 perity in the Middle East;
2623 Whereas, on October 8, 1997, the Secretary of State des-
2724 ignated Hamas a foreign terrorist organization in accord-
2825 ance with section 219 of the Immigration and Nationality
29-VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:25 Mar 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SR72.ATS SR72
30-kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2
31-SRES 72 ATS
3226 Act (8 U.S.C. 1189) for their repeated support for acts
3327 of terrorism;
28+VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:12 Feb 12, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SR72.IS SR72
29+ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2
30+•SRES 72 IS
3431 Whereas, since 2007, Hamas has served as the de facto gov-
3532 erning body in the Gaza Strip;
3633 Whereas, on October 7, 2023, Hamas—
3734 (1) launched an unprovoked attack against the State
3835 of Israel;
3936 (2) brutally murdered more than 1,200 innocent
4037 men, women, and children;
4138 (3) took more than 250 individuals hostage; and
4239 (4) injured thousands more individuals in the dead-
4340 liest attack on the Jewish people since the Holocaust;
4441 Whereas the United States Government has concluded that—
4542 (1) ‘‘Hamas has received funding, weapons, and
4643 training from the Islamic Republic of Iran’’; and
4744 (2) ‘‘Iran provides up to $100,000,000 annually in
4845 combined support to Palestinian terrorist groups, includ-
4946 ing Hamas’’; and
5047 Whereas Hamas has threatened to attack the State of Israel
5148 again and stated ‘‘We must teach Israel a lesson, and we
5249 will do this again and again. The Al-Aqsa Deluge [the
5350 name Hamas gave its October 7 onslaught] is just the
5451 first time, and there will be a second, a third, a fourth’’:
5552 Now, therefore, be it
5653 Resolved, That the Senate— 1
5754 (1) affirms that Hamas cannot be allowed to 2
5855 retain any political or military control in the Gaza 3
5956 Strip; 4
6057 (2) calls upon the President to use all economic 5
6158 and diplomatic tools possible to halt all sources of 6
62-VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:25 Mar 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR72.ATS SR72
63-kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3
64-SRES 72 ATS
65-funding for Hamas from the Islamic Republic of 1
66-Iran and all other sources of revenue; and 2
67-(3) supports the State of Israel as it continues 3
68-to defend its sovereignty against attacks from 4
69-Hamas, the Islamic Republic of Iran, and all other 5
70-Iranian proxies. 6
59+funding for Hamas from the Islamic Republic of 7
60+Iran and all other sources of revenue; and 8
61+VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:12 Feb 12, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR72.IS SR72
62+ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3
63+•SRES 72 IS
64+(3) supports the State of Israel as it continues 1
65+to defend its sovereignty against attacks from 2
66+Hamas, the Islamic Republic of Iran, and all other 3
67+Iranian proxies. 4
7168 Æ
72-VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:25 Mar 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SR72.ATS SR72
73-kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB
69+VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:12 Feb 12, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SR72.IS SR72
70+ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS