Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House of Representatives 2025 Bills & Legislation

US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB405

Introduced
1/15/25  
Keep Every Extra Penny Act of 2025
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB406

Introduced
1/15/25  
PROTECT Jewish Student and Faculty Act Promote Restoring Order To End Campus Targeting of Jewish Students and Faculty Act
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB407

Introduced
1/15/25  
Prevent Tariff Abuse Act
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB408

Introduced
1/15/25  
This bill nullifies two presidential memoranda that were published on January 6, 2025, including (1) the Memorandum on the Withdrawal of Certain Areas of the United States Outer Continental Shelf from Oil or Natural Gas Leasing, relating to the Gulf of Mexico, Atlantic, and Pacific areas of the Outer Continental Shelf (OCS); and (2) the Memorandum on the Withdrawal of Certain Areas of the United States Outer Continental Shelf from Oil or Natural Gas Leasing, relating to the Bering Sea areas of the OCS. The memoranda prohibited the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management (BOEM) from issuing offshore leases for the exploration, development, or production (i.e., offshore drilling) of oil or natural gas in those areas.This bill reverses the withdrawal to allow BOEM to issue leases in those areas.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB409

Introduced
1/15/25  
Supporting Transit Commutes Act This bill provides employers a tax deduction for certain transportation fringe benefits given to employees.Under the bill, employers may deduct costs for providing employees transportation in a commuter highway vehicle (e.g., van pool) between the employee’s home and place of work or a transit pass. The amount of the deduction cannot exceed the aggregate exclusion amount for such fringe benefits ($325 per month per employee in 2025 and adjusted annually). Further, under the bill, the deduction cannot exceed 50% of such amount for transportation fringe benefits provided under a salary reduction agreement.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB41

Introduced
1/3/25  
Unrecognized Southeast Alaska Native Communities Recognition and Compensation ActThis bill allows five Alaska Native communities in Southeast Alaska to form urban corporations and receive land entitlements.Specifically, the bill allows the Alaska Native residents of each of the Alaska Native villages of Haines, Ketchikan, Petersburg, Tenakee, and Wrangell, Alaska, to organize as Alaska Native urban corporations and to receive certain settlement land.The bill directs the Department of the Interior to convey specified land to each urban corporation. Further, Interior must convey the subsurface estate for that land to the regional corporation for Southeast Alaska.The land conveyed to each urban corporation must include any U.S. interest in all roads, trails, log transfer facilities, leases, and appurtenances on or related to the land conveyed to the urban corporation.The bill also allows each urban corporation to establish a settlement trust to (1) promote the health, education, and welfare of the trust beneficiaries; and (2) preserve the Alaska Native heritage and culture of their communities.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB410

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/15/25  
Alaska Native Vietnam Era Veterans Land Allotment Extension Act of 2025This bill extends for an additional five years the time period during which an eligible Alaska Native veteran may apply for a land allotment under the Alaska Native Vietnam Era Veterans Land Allotment Program. The program makes Alaska Native veterans who served in the Armed Forces in Vietnam between August 5, 1964, and December 31, 1971, or their heirs eligible to receive up to 160 acres of federal land in Alaska.Under the current program, the Department of the Interior's Bureau of Land Management may accept applications through December 29, 2025. This bill extends this time period for an additional five years to December 29, 2030.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB411

Introduced
1/15/25  
Keweenaw Bay Indian Community Land Claim Settlement Act of 2025
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB412

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/15/25  
This bill allows the Bay Mills Indian Community of Michigan to transfer, lease, encumber, or otherwise convey its real property that is not held in trust by the United States. The United States shall not be held liable for any loss resulting from a transfer of real property by the tribe.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB413

Introduced
1/15/25  
Combating High Inflation Limiting Daycare Act of 2025 or the CHILD Act of 2025This bill increases the maximum annual amount that may be contributed to a dependent care assistance program (generally known as a dependent care flexible spending account [FSA]).Under the bill, the maximum annual amount that may be contributed to a dependent care FSA increases from $5,000 ($2,500 for married taxpayers who file separate federal tax returns) to $10,000 ($5,000 for married taxpayers who file separate federal tax returns) and is adjusted annually for inflation.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB414

Introduced
1/15/25  
Student Visa Security Improvement ActThis bill establishes new requirements for foreign student visas and participating educational institutions. The Department of Homeland Security (DHS) must review the applications of student visa applicants and conduct in-person interviews when appropriate to determine whether they are inadmissible due to terrorist-related activities. DHS must also conduct on-site reviews of applications and supporting documents deemed appropriate prior to final adjudication.Institutions and exchange student visitor programs must ensure that student visa-holders are active participants in the program. Students must be regularly observed and must be reported on if they transfer or change majors. The bill also provides for enhanced access to the Student and Exchange Visitor Information System for institutions and programs that meet staffing and training requirements.The Government Accountability Office must review the fees for the Student and Exchange Visitor program.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB415

Introduced
1/15/25  
Stop ActThis bill prohibits federal officeholders from directly soliciting contributions for certain federal election purposes. Specifically, the bill prohibits a federal officeholder from soliciting funds directly from any person (1) for or on behalf of any political committee, or (2) for or on the behalf of any person for use for federal election activity. However, a federal officeholder may participate in a fundraising event (e.g., planning, attending, or speaking at an event), as long as the federal officeholder does not engage in any written or verbal solicitation of funds in connection with the event.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB416

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/15/25  
No Welfare for the Wealthy Act of 2025
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB417

Introduced
1/15/25  
End U.N. Censorship ActThis bill specifies that no federal funds may be made available to support the iVerify tool (a fact-checking tool developed by the United Nations Development Programme) or any other effort that seeks to label speech or expression as mal-, mis-, or dis-information.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB418

Introduced
1/15/25  
Ensuring Accountability in Agency Rulemaking Act

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records