Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0054 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 3, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023
Fiscal Note March 1, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023
Fiscal Note February 21, 2023
Bill December 20, 2022
Fiscal Note December 20, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 2, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 27, 2023
Analysis February 16, 2023