LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Utah UT
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB0056
Draft Versions
UT
Utah House Bill HB0056
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Utah 2023 Regular Session
Utah House Bill HB0056
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
February 1, 2023
Bill
January 31, 2023
Compare
Fiscal Note
January 13, 2023
Bill
December 21, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 9, 2023
Compare
Amended
Bill
February 3, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
January 31, 2023