Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0057 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2023
Fiscal Note January 27, 2023
Fiscal Note January 9, 2023
Bill December 20, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis January 24, 2023