Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0058 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 20, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023
Fiscal Note January 19, 2023
Fiscal Note January 9, 2023
Bill December 20, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis January 19, 2023
Analysis January 18, 2023
Analysis January 17, 2023