Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0060 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note February 20, 2023
Fiscal Note February 8, 2023
Bill February 2, 2023
Fiscal Note January 18, 2023
Bill December 29, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 16, 2023
Analysis February 2, 2023