Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0380 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023
Fiscal Note February 28, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023
Fiscal Note February 14, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023
Fiscal Note February 7, 2023
Bill February 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 27, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023