Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0382 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 20, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023
Fiscal Note February 16, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023
Fiscal Note February 14, 2023
Fiscal Note February 8, 2023
Bill February 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 16, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023