Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0389 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023
Fiscal Note February 12, 2023
Fiscal Note February 7, 2023
Bill February 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 9, 2023