Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0409 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 23, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023
Fiscal Note February 8, 2023
Bill February 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 21, 2023