Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0410 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 27, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023
Fiscal Note February 16, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023
Fiscal Note February 12, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023