Utah 2023 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0415 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/10/2023

                    Enrolled Copy	H.B. 415
1	MATERNAL COVERAGE AMENDMENTS
2	2023 GENERAL SESSION
3	STATE OF UTAH
4	Chief Sponsor:  Ashlee Matthews
5	Senate Sponsor:  Luz Escamilla
6Cosponsors:
7Gay Lynn Bennion
8Kera Birkeland
9Joel K. Briscoe
10Tyler Clancy
11Jennifer Dailey-Provost
Stephanie Gricius
Sahara Hayes
Sandra Hollins
Marsha Judkins
Rosemary T. Lesser
Carol S. Moss
Karen M. Peterson
Angela Romero
Douglas R. Welton
12 
13LONG TITLE
14General Description:
15 This bill requires the Public Employees' Benefit and Insurance Program to cover
16pregnancy and childbirth services.
17Highlighted Provisions:
18 This bill:
19 <defines terms;
20 <requires coverage of pregnancy and childbirth services by the Public Employees'
21Benefit and Insurance Program, including:
22 Cdoula services;
23 Cservices by a licensed direct-entry midwife; and
24 Cservices at a free-standing birthing center;
25 <requires the program to report on its coverage of pregnancy and childbirth services
26to the Health and Human Services Interim Committee; and
27 <provides a repeal date.
28Money Appropriated in this Bill: H.B. 415	Enrolled Copy
- 2 -
29 None
30Other Special Clauses:
31 None
32Utah Code Sections Affected:
33AMENDS:
34 63I-2-249, as last amended by Laws of Utah 2021, Chapter 64
35ENACTS:
36 49-20-422, Utah Code Annotated 1953
37 
38Be it enacted by the Legislature of the state of Utah:
39 Section 1.  Section 49-20-422 is enacted to read:
40 49-20-422. Coverage of pregnancy and childbirth services, including doula,
41direct-entry midwife, and birthing center services.
42 (1)  As used in this section:
43 (a)  "Doula" means an individual who:
44 (i)  provides information and physical and emotional support:
45 (A)  to a pregnant or postpartum individual; and
46 (B)  related to the pregnant or postpartum individual's pregnancy; and
47 (ii)  is certified by one or more organizations approved by the program.
48 (b)  "Pregnancy and childbirth services" means services provided to a pregnant
49individual before, during, or shortly after childbirth:
50 (i)  by a doula for the services described in Subsections (1)(a)(i) and (ii); and
51 (ii)  at a birthing center that:
52 (A)  is licensed under Title 26, Chapter 21, Health Care Facility Licensing and
53Inspection Act, or accredited by the Commission for the Accreditation of Birth Centers; and
54 (B) may include services by a direct-entry midwife licensed under Title 58, Chapter 77,
55Direct-Entry Midwife Act, if the direct-entry midwife is engaged in the practice of direct-entry
56midwifery, as defined in Section 58-77-102. Enrolled Copy	H.B. 415
- 3 -
57 (c)  "Qualified individual" means a covered individual who is:
58 (i)  within the state employees' risk pool; and
59 (ii) (A)  is pregnant; or
60 (B)  was pregnant within the past six months.
61 (2)  For a plan year that begins on or after July 1, 2023, and before July 1, 2026, the
62program shall cover pregnancy and childbirth services to a qualified individual.
63 (3)  The program may establish limits for coverage under Subsection (2), including
64limits based on:
65 (a)  the type or number of services provided;
66 (b)  a qualified individual's physical or emotional condition; and
67 (c)  conditions for provider participation.
68 (4)  The program shall report to the Health and Human Services Interim Committee on
69or before October 1 of each year regarding coverage provided under Subsection (2), including:
70 (a)  covered providers;
71 (b)  covered services;
72 (c)  provider payment rates;
73 (d)  covered-individual cost sharing;
74 (e)  total provider payments and covered-individual cost sharing; and
75 (f)  any indicators of whether pregnancy and childbirth services covered under
76Subsection (2) have:
77 (i)  reduced pregnancy or postpartum coverage costs; or
78 (ii)  improved pregnancy or postpartum care.
79 Section 2.  Section 63I-2-249 is amended to read:
80 63I-2-249.  Repeal dates: Title 49.
81 (1)  Subsection 49-20-420(3), regarding a requirement to report to the Legislature, is
82repealed January 1, 2030.
83 (2)  Section 49-20-422, regarding coverage for pregnancy and childbirth services, is
84repealed July 1, 2027. H.B. 415	Enrolled Copy
- 4 -
85