Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0415 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 21, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023
Fiscal Note February 12, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Amended

Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 15, 2023