Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0426 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 17, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023
Fiscal Note February 15, 2023
Fiscal Note February 14, 2023
Fiscal Note February 13, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2023

Amended

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 15, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023