Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0428 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note February 14, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 22, 2023