Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0429 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2023
Fiscal Note February 24, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023
Fiscal Note February 21, 2023
Fiscal Note February 16, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Amended

Bill March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023