Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0432 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023
Fiscal Note February 15, 2023
Fiscal Note February 13, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 15, 2023