Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0437 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Enrolled Copy H.B. 437
1+H.B. 437
2+LEGISLATIVE GENERAL COUNSEL
3+6 Approved for Filing: C. Williams 6
4+6 02-09-23 2:06 PM 6
5+H.B. 437
26 1 HEALTH SERVICES AMENDMENTS
37 2 2023 GENERAL SESSION
48 3 STATE OF UTAH
59 4 Chief Sponsor: James A. Dunnigan
6-5 Senate Sponsor: Wayne A. Harper
10+5 Senate Sponsor: ____________
711 6
812 7LONG TITLE
913 8General Description:
1014 9 This bill is related to certain health care services.
1115 10Highlighted Provisions:
1216 11 This bill:
1317 12 <requires the Department of Health and Human Services to report to the Health and
1418 13Human Services Interim Committee on tardive dyskinesia;
1519 14 <requires the Medicaid program to reimburse for audio-only telehealth services as
1620 15specified by division rule;
1721 16 <requires the Department of Health and Human Services to report to the Health and
1822 17Human Services Interim Committee on payment by the Medicaid program for
1923 18long-acting injectable typical and atypical antipsychotics; and
2024 19 <establishes repeal dates.
2125 20Money Appropriated in this Bill:
2226 21 None
2327 22Other Special Clauses:
2428 23 None
2529 24Utah Code Sections Affected:
2630 25AMENDS:
2731 26 26-18-13.5, as last amended by Laws of Utah 2019, Chapter 249
2832 27 63I-2-226, as last amended by Laws of Utah 2022, Chapters 255, 365
33+*HB0437* H.B. 437 02-09-23 2:06 PM
34+- 2 -
2935 28ENACTS:
30-29 26-10-16, Utah Code Annotated 1953 H.B. 437 Enrolled Copy
31-- 2 -
36+29 26-10-16, Utah Code Annotated 1953
3237 30 26-18-29, Utah Code Annotated 1953
3338 31
3439 32Be it enacted by the Legislature of the state of Utah:
3540 33 Section 1. Section 26-10-16 is enacted to read:
3641 34 26-10-16. Tardive dyskinesia.
3742 35 With respect to tardive dyskinesia, the department shall report on the following to the
3843 36Health and Human Services Interim Committee before November 1, 2023:
3944 37 (1) resources available to help health care providers, including mental health providers,
4045 38accurately diagnose and appropriately treat tardive dyskinesia;
4146 39 (2) resources available to help an individual with tardive dyskinesia, and the
4247 40individual's caregivers, respond to the functional and social challenges posed by the condition;
4348 41 (3) options for improving screening, diagnosis, and treatment of tardive dyskinesia,
4449 42including actions the department may take on behalf of:
4550 43 (a) residents of the state generally;
4651 44 (b) Medicaid program enrollees; and
4752 45 (c) individuals receiving services under a local mental health authority, as defined in
4853 46Section 62A-15-102; and
4954 47 (4) the potential costs and benefits of implementing the options reported under
5055 48Subsection (3).
5156 49 Section 2. Section 26-18-13.5 is amended to read:
5257 50 26-18-13.5. Reimbursement of telemedicine services, audio-only telehealth
5358 51services and telepsychiatric consultations.
5459 52 (1) As used in this section:
5560 53 (a) "Telehealth services" means the same as that term is defined in Section 26-60-102.
5661 54 (b) "Telemedicine services" means the same as that term is defined in Section
5762 5526-60-102.
5863 56 (c) "Telepsychiatric consultation" means a consultation between a physician and a
59-57board certified psychiatrist, both of whom are licensed to engage in the practice of medicine in Enrolled Copy H.B. 437
64+57board certified psychiatrist, both of whom are licensed to engage in the practice of medicine in
65+58the state, that utilizes: 02-09-23 2:06 PM H.B. 437
6066 - 3 -
61-58the state, that utilizes:
6267 59 (i) the health records of the patient, provided from the patient or the referring
6368 60physician;
6469 61 (ii) a written, evidence-based patient questionnaire; and
6570 62 (iii) telehealth services that meet industry security and privacy standards, including
6671 63compliance with the:
6772 64 (A) Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act; and
6873 65 (B) Health Information Technology for Economic and Clinical Health Act, Pub. L. No.
6974 66111-5, 123 Stat. 226, 467, as amended.
7075 67 (2) This section applies to:
7176 68 (a) a managed care organization that contracts with the Medicaid program; and
7277 69 (b) a provider who is reimbursed for health care services under the Medicaid program.
7378 70 (3) The Medicaid program shall reimburse for telemedicine services at the same rate
7479 71that the Medicaid program reimburses for other health care services.
7580 72 (4) The Medicaid program shall reimburse for audio-only telehealth services as
76-73specified by division rule.
81+73specified by division rule
7782 74 [(4)] (5) The Medicaid program shall reimburse for telepsychiatric consultations at a
7883 75rate set by the Medicaid program.
7984 76 Section 3. Section 26-18-29 is enacted to read:
8085 77 26-18-29. Long-acting injectables.
8186 78 (1) With respect to payments by the Medicaid program for long-acting injectable
8287 79typical and atypical antipsychotics, the department shall report on the following to the Health
8388 80and Human Services Interim Committee before November 1, 2023:
8489 81 (a) options for payment, including the benefits and cost of each option; and
8590 82 (b) whether payment should be included in a bundled payment made to a hospital.
8691 83 (2) The department shall prepare the report with input from health care providers.
8792 84 Section 4. Section 63I-2-226 is amended to read:
88-85 63I-2-226. Repeal dates: Titles 26 through 26B. H.B. 437 Enrolled Copy
89-- 4 -
93+85 63I-2-226. Repeal dates: Titles 26 through 26B.
9094 86 (1) Subsection 26-2-12.6(3), relating to the report for birth certificate fees, is repealed
9195 87December 31, 2022.
9296 88 (2) Subsection 26-7-8(3) is repealed January 1, 2027.
93-89 (3) Section 26-8a-107 is repealed July 1, 2024.
97+89 (3) Section 26-8a-107 is repealed July 1, 2024. H.B. 437 02-09-23 2:06 PM
98+- 4 -
9499 90 (4) Subsection 26-8a-203(3)(a)(i) is repealed January 1, 2023.
95100 91 (5) Section 26-8a-211 is repealed July 1, 2023.
96101 92 (6) In relation to the Air Ambulance Committee, on July 1, 2024, Subsection
97102 9326-8a-602(1)(a) is amended to read:
98103 94 "(a) provide the patient or the patient's representative with the following information
99104 95before contacting an air medical transport provider:
100105 96 (i) which health insurers in the state the air medical transport provider contracts with;
101106 97 (ii) if sufficient data is available, the average charge for air medical transport services
102107 98for a patient who is uninsured or out of network; and
103108 99 (iii) whether the air medical transport provider balance bills a patient for any charge not
104109 100paid by the patient's health insurer; and".
105110 101 (7) Section 26-10-16 is repealed July 1, 2024.
106111 102 [(7)] (8) Subsection 26-18-2.4(3)(e) is repealed January 1, 2023.
107112 103 (9) Section 26-18-29 is repealed July 1, 2024.
108113 104 [(8)] (10) Subsection 26-18-411(8), related to reporting on the health coverage
109114 105improvement program, is repealed January 1, 2023.
110115 106 [(9)] (11) Subsection 26-18-420(5), related to reporting on coverage for in vitro
111116 107fertilization and genetic testing, is repealed July 1, 2030.
112117 108 [(10)] (12) In relation to the Air Ambulance Committee, July 1, 2024, Subsection
113118 10926-21-32(1)(a) is amended to read:
114119 110 "(a) provide the patient or the patient's representative with the following information
115120 111before contacting an air medical transport provider:
116121 112 (i) which health insurers in the state the air medical transport provider contracts with;
117-113 (ii) if sufficient data is available, the average charge for air medical transport services Enrolled Copy H.B. 437
118-- 5 -
122+113 (ii) if sufficient data is available, the average charge for air medical transport services
119123 114for a patient who is uninsured or out of network; and
120124 115 (iii) whether the air medical transport provider balance bills a patient for any charge not
121125 116paid by the patient's health insurer; and".
122126 117 [(11)] (13) Subsection 26-33a-106.1(2)(a) is repealed January 1, 2023.
123127 118 [(12)] (14) Title 26, Chapter 46, Utah Health Care Workforce Financial Assistance
124128 119Program, is repealed July 1, 2027.
125-120 [(13)] (15) Subsection 26-61-202(4)(b) is repealed January 1, 2022.
129+120 [(13)] (15) Subsection 26-61-202(4)(b) is repealed January 1, 2022. 02-09-23 2:06 PM H.B. 437
130+- 5 -
126131 121 [(14)] (16) Subsection 26-61-202(5) is repealed January 1, 2022.
127132 122 [(15)] (17) Subsection 26B-1-204(2)(f), relating to the Air Ambulance Committee, is
128133 123repealed July 1, 2024.