House
|
03/03/2023
|
House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
|
02/09/2023
|
LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
|
|
|
|
02/09/2023
|
Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
|
|
|
|
02/09/2023
|
Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
|
|
|