LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Utah UT
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB0444
Draft Versions
UT
Utah House Bill HB0444
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Utah 2023 Regular Session
Utah House Bill HB0444
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
February 23, 2023
Bill
February 21, 2023
Compare
Fiscal Note
February 15, 2023
Bill
February 10, 2023
Compare
Amended
Bill
February 23, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
February 21, 2023
Analysis
February 20, 2023