Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0447 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023
Fiscal Note February 28, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note February 15, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 28, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023