Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0449 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023
Fiscal Note March 2, 2023
Fiscal Note March 1, 2023
Fiscal Note February 23, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023
Fiscal Note February 16, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 2, 2023
Analysis February 28, 2023
Analysis February 27, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023