Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0469 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 3, 2023
Fiscal Note March 2, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023
Fiscal Note February 28, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note February 21, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 28, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023