Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0470 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 25, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note February 17, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2023

Amended

Bill February 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 23, 2023