Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0481 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023
Fiscal Note February 28, 2023
Fiscal Note February 27, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023
Fiscal Note February 22, 2023
Fiscal Note February 20, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 28, 2023
Analysis February 27, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023

Amended

Bill February 27, 2023