Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0538 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023
Fiscal Note March 3, 2023
Fiscal Note March 2, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023
Fiscal Note February 28, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note February 24, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 3, 2023
Analysis February 28, 2023
Analysis February 26, 2023