Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HCR006 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 24, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023
Fiscal Note February 13, 2023
Bill February 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 21, 2023