|
03/13/2023
|
House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
|
03/01/2023
|
Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
|
|
|
|
03/01/2023
|
Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
|
|
|
|
02/28/2023
|
House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2023
|
House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
|
02/24/2023
|
Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
|
|
|
|
02/24/2023
|
Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
|
|
|