LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Utah UT
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB0084
Draft Versions
UT
Utah House Bill HB0084
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Utah 2025 Regular Session
Utah House Bill HB0084
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
February 28, 2025
Fiscal Note
January 24, 2025
Fiscal Note
January 16, 2025
Bill
January 2, 2025
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 7, 2025
Compare
Substitute
Bill
February 24, 2025
Compare
Bill
January 23, 2025
Compare
Amended
Bill
February 19, 2025
Compare