Utah 2025 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0153 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 4, 2025
Fiscal Note February 17, 2025
Fiscal Note February 4, 2025
Fiscal Note January 14, 2025
Bill January 9, 2025

Substitute

Bill March 3, 2025
Bill February 12, 2025
Bill January 29, 2025

Amended

Bill February 18, 2025