1 | 1 | | 01-13 16:30 H.B. 185 |
---|
2 | 2 | | 1 |
---|
3 | 3 | | Railroad Modifications |
---|
4 | 4 | | 2025 GENERAL SESSION |
---|
5 | 5 | | STATE OF UTAH |
---|
6 | 6 | | Chief Sponsor: Tyler Clancy |
---|
7 | 7 | | 2 |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | 3 |
---|
10 | 10 | | LONG TITLE |
---|
11 | 11 | | 4 |
---|
12 | 12 | | General Description: |
---|
13 | 13 | | 5 |
---|
14 | 14 | | This bill addresses emissions from railroad locomotives. |
---|
15 | 15 | | 6 |
---|
16 | 16 | | Highlighted Provisions: |
---|
17 | 17 | | 7 |
---|
18 | 18 | | This bill: |
---|
19 | 19 | | 8 |
---|
20 | 20 | | ▸ defines terms; |
---|
21 | 21 | | 9 |
---|
22 | 22 | | ▸ requires the Division of Air Quality (division) to conduct an inventory related to |
---|
23 | 23 | | 10 |
---|
24 | 24 | | emissions from railyards in certain counties in the state; |
---|
25 | 25 | | 11 |
---|
26 | 26 | | ▸ requires the division to propose an emissions reduction plan for emissions from certain |
---|
27 | 27 | | 12 |
---|
28 | 28 | | railroad locomotives to be implemented by December 31, 2027; |
---|
29 | 29 | | 13 |
---|
30 | 30 | | ▸ requires the division to recommend state action for implementing the emissions reduction |
---|
31 | 31 | | 14 |
---|
32 | 32 | | plan; and |
---|
33 | 33 | | 15 |
---|
34 | 34 | | ▸ requires the division to report on the inventory, plan, and recommendations. |
---|
35 | 35 | | 16 |
---|
36 | 36 | | Money Appropriated in this Bill: |
---|
37 | 37 | | 17 |
---|
38 | 38 | | None |
---|
39 | 39 | | 18 |
---|
40 | 40 | | Other Special Clauses: |
---|
41 | 41 | | 19 |
---|
42 | 42 | | None |
---|
43 | 43 | | 20 |
---|
44 | 44 | | Utah Code Sections Affected: |
---|
45 | 45 | | 21 |
---|
46 | 46 | | AMENDS: |
---|
47 | 47 | | 22 |
---|
48 | 48 | | 63I-2-219, as last amended by Laws of Utah 2024, Third Special Session, Chapter 5 |
---|
49 | 49 | | 23 |
---|
50 | 50 | | ENACTS: |
---|
51 | 51 | | 24 |
---|
52 | 52 | | 19-2a-108, Utah Code Annotated 1953 |
---|
53 | 53 | | 25 |
---|
54 | 54 | | |
---|
55 | 55 | | 26 |
---|
56 | 56 | | Be it enacted by the Legislature of the state of Utah: |
---|
57 | 57 | | 27 |
---|
58 | 58 | | Section 1. Section 19-2a-108 is enacted to read: |
---|
59 | 59 | | 28 |
---|
60 | 60 | | 19-2a-108 . Railroad emissions study -- Emissions reduction plan -- Report. |
---|
61 | 61 | | 29 |
---|
62 | 62 | | (1) As used in this section: |
---|
63 | 63 | | 30 |
---|
64 | 64 | | (a) "Division" means the Division of Air Quality created in Section 19-1-105. |
---|
65 | 65 | | 31 |
---|
66 | 66 | | (b) "Local yard service" means the same as that term is defined in Section 56-2-1. H.B. 185 01-13 16:30 |
---|
67 | 67 | | 32 |
---|
68 | 68 | | (c) "Ozone nonattainment area" means an area that does not meet the primary or |
---|
69 | 69 | | 33 |
---|
70 | 70 | | secondary air quality standards for ozone under the national ambient air quality |
---|
71 | 71 | | 34 |
---|
72 | 72 | | standards described in 42 U.S.C. Sec. 7407(d). |
---|
73 | 73 | | 35 |
---|
74 | 74 | | (d)(i) "Ozone nonattainment county" means a county in this state partially or wholly |
---|
75 | 75 | | 36 |
---|
76 | 76 | | included in an ozone nonattainment area. |
---|
77 | 77 | | 37 |
---|
78 | 78 | | (ii) "Ozone nonattainment county" includes: |
---|
79 | 79 | | 38 |
---|
80 | 80 | | (A) Davis County; |
---|
81 | 81 | | 39 |
---|
82 | 82 | | (B) Salt Lake County; |
---|
83 | 83 | | 40 |
---|
84 | 84 | | (C) Tooele County; |
---|
85 | 85 | | 41 |
---|
86 | 86 | | (D) Utah County; and |
---|
87 | 87 | | 42 |
---|
88 | 88 | | (E) Weber County. |
---|
89 | 89 | | 43 |
---|
90 | 90 | | (e)(i) "Railroad locomotive" means an engine-powered piece of equipment that: |
---|
91 | 91 | | 44 |
---|
92 | 92 | | (A) operates on rails; and |
---|
93 | 93 | | 45 |
---|
94 | 94 | | (B) is designed for moving a railroad engine or railroad car. |
---|
95 | 95 | | 46 |
---|
96 | 96 | | (ii) "Railroad locomotive" does not include equipment: |
---|
97 | 97 | | 47 |
---|
98 | 98 | | (A) designed for operation on a roadway; |
---|
99 | 99 | | 48 |
---|
100 | 100 | | (B) powered by an engine or engines with a total power output of less than 750 |
---|
101 | 101 | | 49 |
---|
102 | 102 | | kilowatts or 1006 horsepower; or |
---|
103 | 103 | | 50 |
---|
104 | 104 | | (C) operated for historical display or non-commercial use. |
---|
105 | 105 | | 51 |
---|
106 | 106 | | (2) By no later than September 30, 2025, the division shall complete: |
---|
107 | 107 | | 52 |
---|
108 | 108 | | (a) an air emissions inventory of all railyards located in an ozone nonattainment county |
---|
109 | 109 | | 53 |
---|
110 | 110 | | for: |
---|
111 | 111 | | 54 |
---|
112 | 112 | | (i) nitrogen oxides; |
---|
113 | 113 | | 55 |
---|
114 | 114 | | (ii) carbon monoxide; |
---|
115 | 115 | | 56 |
---|
116 | 116 | | (iii) particulate matter; and |
---|
117 | 117 | | 57 |
---|
118 | 118 | | (iv) other compounds the division identifies for the inventory; |
---|
119 | 119 | | 58 |
---|
120 | 120 | | (b) an emissions reduction plan to reduce the emissions of compounds described in |
---|
121 | 121 | | 59 |
---|
122 | 122 | | Subsection (2)(a): |
---|
123 | 123 | | 60 |
---|
124 | 124 | | (i) from railroad locomotives operating in railyards located in ozone nonattainment |
---|
125 | 125 | | 61 |
---|
126 | 126 | | counties: |
---|
127 | 127 | | 62 |
---|
128 | 128 | | (A) designed or used for local yard service; or |
---|
129 | 129 | | 63 |
---|
130 | 130 | | (B) designed with a maximum output of less than 2300 horsepower; and |
---|
131 | 131 | | 64 |
---|
132 | 132 | | (ii) to the following levels by no later than December 31, 2027: |
---|
133 | 133 | | 65 |
---|
134 | 134 | | (A) for nitrogen oxides, 5.0 grams per brake horsepower-hour; |
---|
135 | 135 | | - 2 - 01-13 16:30 H.B. 185 |
---|
136 | 136 | | 66 |
---|
137 | 137 | | (B) for carbon monoxide, 2.4 grams per brake horsepower-hour; and |
---|
138 | 138 | | 67 |
---|
139 | 139 | | (C) for particulate matter, 0.10 grams per brake horsepower-hour; and |
---|
140 | 140 | | 68 |
---|
141 | 141 | | (c) recommendations for actions that the state should take to implement the plan |
---|
142 | 142 | | 69 |
---|
143 | 143 | | described in Subsection (2)(b). |
---|
144 | 144 | | 70 |
---|
145 | 145 | | (3) The division shall report to the Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment |
---|
146 | 146 | | 71 |
---|
147 | 147 | | Interim Committee on or before the committee's November 2025 interim meeting: |
---|
148 | 148 | | 72 |
---|
149 | 149 | | (a) the findings of the study described in Subsection (2); and |
---|
150 | 150 | | 73 |
---|
151 | 151 | | (b) the division's recommendations for legislative action. |
---|
152 | 152 | | 74 |
---|
153 | 153 | | Section 2. Section 63I-2-219 is amended to read: |
---|
154 | 154 | | 75 |
---|
155 | 155 | | 63I-2-219 . Repeal dates: Title 19. |
---|
156 | 156 | | 76 |
---|
157 | 157 | | (1) Section 19-1-109, Clean Air Support Restricted Account, is repealed July 1, 2024. |
---|
158 | 158 | | 77 |
---|
159 | 159 | | (2) Section 19-2a-102.5, Emissions reduction plan study and recommendations, is repealed |
---|
160 | 160 | | 78 |
---|
161 | 161 | | July 1, 2024. |
---|
162 | 162 | | 79 |
---|
163 | 163 | | (3) Section 19-2a-108, Railroad emissions study -- Emissions reduction plan -- Report, is |
---|
164 | 164 | | 80 |
---|
165 | 165 | | repealed July 1, 2028. |
---|
166 | 166 | | 81 |
---|
167 | 167 | | Section 3. Effective Date. |
---|
168 | 168 | | 82 |
---|
169 | 169 | | This bill takes effect on May 7, 2025. |
---|
170 | 170 | | - 3 - |
---|