Utah 2025 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0260 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 18, 2025
Fiscal Note January 31, 2025
Fiscal Note January 22, 2025
Bill January 17, 2025

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2025

Amended

Bill March 5, 2025

Substitute

Bill February 14, 2025
Bill January 27, 2025