Utah 2025 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0361 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 23, 2025
Fiscal Note February 12, 2025
Fiscal Note February 10, 2025
Fiscal Note January 31, 2025
Bill January 29, 2025

Enrolled

Bill March 12, 2025

Amended

Bill February 27, 2025

Substitute

Bill February 21, 2025
Bill February 10, 2025
Bill February 6, 2025