LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Utah UT
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB0129
Draft Versions
UT
Utah Senate Bill SB0129
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Utah 2025 Regular Session
Utah Senate Bill SB0129
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
February 27, 2025
Fiscal Note
February 10, 2025
Fiscal Note
January 19, 2025
Bill
January 16, 2025
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 13, 2025
Compare
Amended
Bill
February 27, 2025
Compare
Substitute
Bill
February 26, 2025
Compare
Bill
February 25, 2025
Compare
Bill
February 7, 2025
Compare