Utah 2025 Regular Session

Utah Senate Bill SB0163 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 7, 2025
Fiscal Note March 6, 2025
Fiscal Note March 4, 2025
Fiscal Note February 16, 2025
Fiscal Note January 28, 2025
Bill January 24, 2025

Substitute

Bill March 7, 2025
Bill March 6, 2025
Bill March 2, 2025
Bill February 13, 2025