LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Utah UT
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB0274
Draft Versions
UT
Utah Senate Bill SB0274
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Utah 2025 Regular Session
Utah Senate Bill SB0274
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
March 5, 2025
Fiscal Note
February 24, 2025
Fiscal Note
February 18, 2025
Bill
February 13, 2025
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 7, 2025
Compare
Substitute
Bill
March 5, 2025
Compare
Bill
February 21, 2025
Compare