House
|
04/02/2025
|
House sustained Governor's veto
|
|
|
|
03/24/2025
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/11/2025
|
Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 24, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Signed by President
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Signed by Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1915ER)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (HB1915)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Senate substitute agreed to by House (51-Y 47-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Education and Health Substitute agreed to
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Reading of substitute waived
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Read third time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Passed by for the day
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 2nd reading)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Committee substitute printed 25107245D-S1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
Assigned Education sub: Public Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Education and Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading)
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
Read third time and passed House (49-Y 48-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Read second time and engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
01/15/2025
|
Reported from Education (11-Y 10-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2025
|
Assigned Educ sub: K-12 Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2025
|
Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-13-2025 25102305D
|
|
|