House | 02/04/2025 | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (HB1916) | ||
House | 01/24/2025 | Passed by for the day | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources | ||
House | 01/06/2025 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | ||
House | 01/06/2025 | Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-13-2025 25101792D |