Senate | 02/10/2025 | Passed by indefinitely in Local Government (9-Y 6-N) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading) | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 5-N) | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Read second time and engrossed | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 01/24/2025 | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 2-N) | ||
House | 01/17/2025 | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Assigned CCT sub: Subcommittee #3 | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Impact statement from TAX (HB2012) | ||
House | 01/07/2025 | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | ||
House | 01/07/2025 | Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-13-2025 25104263D |