House | 02/05/2025 | Left in Health and Human Services | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Assigned sub: Health | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Referred from General Laws and referred to Health and Human Services (Voice Vote) | ||
House | 01/20/2025 | Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (HB2031) | ||
House | 01/07/2025 | Referred to Committee on General Laws | ||
House | 01/07/2025 | Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-13-2025 25100641D |