|
04/02/2025
|
Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Enacted, Chapter 647 (Effective 07/01/25)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Signed by President as reenrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Reenrolled bill text (HB2034ER2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Reenrolled
|
|
|
|
04/02/2025
|
Governor's recommendation adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
VOTE: Governor's Recommendations - Block Vote Adoption (96-Y 0-N 0-A)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Governor's substitute printed (HB2034H2)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2025
|
Governor's recommendation received by House
|
|
|
|
03/03/2025
|
Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 24, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2025
|
Signed by President
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Signed by Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2034ER)
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (HB2034)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Read third time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Passed by for the day
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 2nd reading) (40-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading)
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Read third time and passed House (80-Y 18-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Printed as engrossed 25102025D-E
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Engrossed by House as amended
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Amendments agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Moved from Uncontested Calendar to Regular Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2025
|
Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2025
|
Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2025
|
Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-13-2025 25102025D
|
|
|