Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (HB2060)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Reported from Commerce and Labor and rereferred to Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Printed as engrossed 25101193D-E
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Engrossed by House as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Appropriations Amendments agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Assigned Approps sub: Compensation and Retirement
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Reported from Labor and Commerce and referred to Appropriations (20-Y 1-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends reporting and referred to Appropriations (8-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2025
|
Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2025
|
Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-13-2025 25101193D
|
|
|