|
03/24/2025
|
Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2025
|
Approved by Governor-Chapter 395 (Effective 07/01/25)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Fiscal Impact Statement from State Corporation Commission (HB2084)
|
|
|
|
03/11/2025
|
Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 24, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Signed by President
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Signed by Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2084ER)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2025
|
Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 17-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2025
|
Conference report agreed to by House (67-Y 32-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2025
|
Conference substitute printed 25108019D-H2
|
|
|
|
02/22/2025
|
Amended by conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Delegates: Shin, Ward, Kilgore
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Conferees appointed by House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Senators: Deeds, Marsden, Obenshain
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Conferees appointed by Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
House acceded to request
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Senate requested conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Senate substitute rejected by House (4-Y 94-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Commerce and Labor Substitute agreed to
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Reading of substitute waived
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Read third time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Passed by for the day
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 2nd reading) (40-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Committee substitute printed 25107587D-S1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading)
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
Read third time and passed House (61-Y 35-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Engrossed by House - committee substitute
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Labor and Commerce Substitute agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Committee substitute printed 25105239D-H1
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 4-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2025
|
Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2025
|
Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-13-2025 25100628D
|
|
|