House | 02/05/2025 | Left in Labor and Commerce | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #4 | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Fiscal Impact Statement from State Corporation Commission (HB2101) | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 | ||
House | 01/07/2025 | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce | ||
House | 01/07/2025 | Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-13-2025 25104441D |